US HB1073 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases by 3.6% the rates of basic pay for federal employees under the statutory pay systems (i.e., the General Schedule, the Foreign Service Schedule, and various schedules related to the Veterans Health Administration) for calendar year 2020. Additionally, it increases by 3.6% the rates of basic pay for prevailing rate employees for FY2020.
Title
FAIR Act Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB5690 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB426 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB5690 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1073/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1073/BILLS-116hr1073ih.pdf |