US HB1063 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Temporarily permits digital marketplace companies (e.g., Lyft, DoorDash, Airbnb, etc.) to provide benefits to workers during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic without such actions establishing those workers as employees or independent contractors or establishing the company as a joint employer under federal, state, or local laws.applies to digital marketplace companies that provide, among other things, financial assistance, health benefits, training, health checks and personal protective equipment to individuals working through such marketplaces during the period beginning on March 15, 2020, and ending on the later of December 31, 2021, or the expiration of the COVID-19 public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Helping Gig Economy Workers Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2021-02-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB338 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback