US HB1057 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supreme Court Ethics Act This bill establishes a new statutory requirement for the Judicial Conference of the United States (Judicial Conference) to issue a judicial code of conduct for judges and justices of U.S. courts (including Justices of the Supreme Court). Currently, the Judicial Conference issues a code of conduct for judges of U.S. courts (but not for Justices of the Supreme Court).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supreme Court Ethics Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-02-13HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1559-1560)
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB393 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback