US HB1057 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 180-93)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Faso asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1057, a bill originally introduced by Representative Tiberi, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Faso asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1057, a bill originally introduced by Representative Tiberi, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STOP Act of 2017 Synthetics Trafficking and Overdose Prevention Act of 2017 This bill amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to make the Postmaster General the consignee (i.e., the entity financially responsible for the receipt of a shipment) for merchandise, excluding documents, imported through the mail into the United States. The Postmaster General must designate licensed customs brokers to file required documents or information for such shipments. The bill amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to impose a customs user fee on postal shipments or any other item valued at $2,000 or less arriving at an international mail facility. The bill amends the Trade Act of 2002 to direct the Department of the Treasury to require the Postmaster General to provide for the advanced electronic transmission to the U.S. Customs and Border Protection of certain information for all postal shipments made by the U.S. Postal Service (USPS), including postal shipments it receives from foreign postal operators. The Postmaster General: shall be liable for civil penalties for postal shipment violations committed by a foreign postal operator or the USPS; may be directly or indirectly responsible for discrepancies resulting from omissions made or false information provided by a foreign postal operator or the USPS; and shall ensure that all costs and penalties associated with complying with this bill are recouped from foreign shippers, foreign postal operators, or U.S. ultimate consignees.
Title
STOP Act of 2017 Synthetics Trafficking and Overdose Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Faso asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1057, a bill originally introduced by Representative Tiberi, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB372 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5531 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5531 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Customs enforcement
Department of the Treasury
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Government liability
International law and treaties
Postal service
Tariffs
U.S. Postal Service
User charges and fees
Customs enforcement
Department of the Treasury
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Government liability
International law and treaties
Postal service
Tariffs
U.S. Postal Service
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1057/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1057/BILLS-115hr1057ih.pdf |