US HB1050 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 98-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ANTIQUITIES Act America's Natural Treasures of Immeasurable Quality Unite, Inspire, and Together Improve the Economies of States Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANTIQUITIES Act America's Natural Treasures of Immeasurable Quality Unite, Inspire, and Together Improve the Economies of States Act

Sponsors

Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB367 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback