US HB1038 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to provide a plan to ensure adequate staffing throughout organizational units of the Department of the Interior and Department of Agriculture to review communications use authorizations in a timely manner.
Title
Enhancing Administrative Reviews for Broadband Deployment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3370 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1038/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1038/BILLS-117hr1038ih.pdf |