US HB1038 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 70-20)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E306)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E306)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to prohibit Medicare Prescription Drug Plan sponsors from retroactively reducing payment on clean claims submitted by pharmacies. (A "clean claim" is a Medicare claim that is free of defects such as incomplete documentation.)
Title
Improving Transparency and Accuracy in Medicare Part D Spending Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E306) |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB413 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1038/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1038/BILLS-115hr1038ih.pdf |