US HB1029 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To Waive the application fee for any special use permit for veterans' special events at war memorials on land administered by the National Park Service in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Title
Free Veterans from Fees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 421 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-10-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 3 (Roll no. 316). (text: CR 7/26/2021 H3858-3859) |
2021-10-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5661-5662) |
2021-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1029. |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3858-3860) |
2021-07-26 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 79. |
2021-07-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-106. |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3240 (Related) 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 620.