US HB1023 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Great Lakes Fishery Research Authorization Act of 2019 This bill authorizes the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS) to conduct monitoring, scientific assessments, and research in support of fisheries within the Great Lakes Basin between the United States and Canada. The USGS shall (1) execute a comprehensive, multi-lake, freshwater fisheries science program; (2) work cooperatively with regional, state, tribal, and local governments; and (3) consult with interested groups, including academia and Canadian agencies. The USGS may provide deepwater ecosystem research, fish behavior and habitat reports, fish population assessments, invasive species research, use of biological equipment and laboratory capabilities necessary to support fishery management decisions, and studies that assess impacts on Great Lakes fishery resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great Lakes Fishery Research Authorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
2019-11-08HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-274.
2019-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-05-08HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB446 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1326 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Presented to President.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback