US HB1017 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of Federal funds to install permanent fencing around the United States Capitol, any of the Capitol Buildings, or any portion of the Capitol Grounds.
Title
No Fencing at the United States Capitol Complex Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E129-130) |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1030 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2083 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB3556 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB2083 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB3556 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1017/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1017/BILLS-117hr1017ih.pdf |