US HB1010 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 29.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To provide that the rule entitled "Short-Term, Limited Duration Insurance" shall have no force or effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide that the rule entitled "Short-Term, Limited Duration Insurance" shall have no force or effect.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 29.
2019-05-10HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2019-05-10HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-43, Part II.
2019-04-29HouseReported by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 116-43, Part I.
2019-04-03HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 22.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 13 .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1884 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback