US HB1009 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildfire Prevention Act of 2015 Amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to authorize the President to provide: (1) hazard mitigation assistance in any area affected by a fire for which assistance was provided, whether or not a major disaster had been declared; and (2) fire management assistance in any area affected by a fire for which hazard mitigation assistance was provided.
Title
Wildfire Prevention Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1471 (Related) 2016-03-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1997 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1997 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1009/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1009/BILLS-114hr1009ih.pdf |