US HB1007 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-16)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement Enhancement and Savings Act of 2019 This bill modifies requirements for tax-favored retirement savings accounts, employer-provided retirement plans, and retirement benefits for federal judges. With respect to employer-provided plans, the bill modifies requirements regarding multiple employer plans, automatic enrollment and nonelective contributions, loans, terminating or transferring plans, reporting and disclosure rules, nondiscrimination rules, selecting lifetime income providers, and Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation premiums. The bill also increases the tax credit for small employer pension plan startup costs and allows a tax credit for small employers that establish retirement plans that include automatic enrollment. With respect to Individual Retirement Accounts (IRAs), the bill treats taxable non-tuition fellowship and stipend payments as compensation, repeals the maximum age for traditional IRA contributions, and permits any IRA to be a shareholder of any S corporation that is a bank. The bill makes several modifications to retirement benefits for magistrate judges of the U.S. Tax Court and other federal judges. The bill also modifies various tax provisions to reinstate and increase the tax exclusion for benefits provided to volunteer firefighters and emergency medical responders, revise the required distribution rules for pension plans, increase penalties for failing to file tax or retirement plan returns, and require the Internal Revenue Service to share returns and return information with U.S. Customs Border Protection to administer the heavy vehicle use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement Enhancement and Savings Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB982 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1084 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1194 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1241 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1439 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB321 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S834-835)
SB354 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB448 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB836 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1938 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB972 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1993 (Related) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2367 (Related) 2019-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB1574 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback