US HB1002 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pisgah National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2009 - Modifies the boundaries of the Pisgah National Forest in McDowell County, North Carolina, to provide for the inclusion of certain private land and Forest Service land in the Forest. Requires an owner's consent to acquire the private land.
Title
Pisgah National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Bob Etheridge [D-NC] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC] | Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] | Rep. Melvin Watt [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. | |
2009-09-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-15 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9519) | |
2009-09-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1002. | |
2009-09-15 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9519-9520) | |
2009-09-15 | Mr. Holden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-09-10 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139. | |
2009-09-10 | Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 111-251. | |
2009-07-29 | Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry Discharged. | |
2009-07-29 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-07-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry. | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1768 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.