TX SJR67 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the enactment of a law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that either convey a security or involve specified derivative contracts.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the enactment of a law that imposes a tax on certain transactions that either convey a security or involve specified derivative contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR140 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
SB2001 (Enabled by) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Finance
SB2001 (Enabled by) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Financial
Financial--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--General
Financial--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SJR67 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00067I.htm |