TX SJR62 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the State Utilities Reliability Fund and the State Utilities Reliability Revenue Fund to provide financial support for projects that enhance the reliability of water, electricity, natural gas and broadband utilities in this state.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the State Utilities Reliability Fund and the State Utilities Reliability Revenue Fund to provide financial support for projects that enhance the reliability of water, electricity, natural gas and broadband utilities in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB1682 (Enabled by) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HJR2 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Received from the House
HJR2 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Received from the House
HJR2 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Received from the House
HJR2 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Received from the House
Subjects
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--General
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--General
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SJR62 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00062I.htm |