TX SJR61 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting temporary suspension of absentee voting procedures.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting temporary suspension of absentee voting procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments