TX SJR55 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the right to own, hold, and use any mutually agreed upon medium of exchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the right to own, hold, and use any mutually agreed upon medium of exchange.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HJR100 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Left pending in committee
HJR100 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback