TX SJR54 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a municipal charter amendment election to be held on certain election dates.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a municipal charter amendment election to be held on certain election dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments