TX SJR47 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment changing the eligibility requirements for certain judicial offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment changing the eligibility requirements for certain judicial offices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Adopted RV#1233 (Y: 120 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20 Filed with the Secretary of State
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1233
2021-05-18HouseAdopted
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenatePassed
2021-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SJR47
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00047I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00047S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00047E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00047H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SJ00047F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SJ00047I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SJ00047I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SJ00047E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SJ00047H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SJ00047F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SJR47&RcdVtNo=1233&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments

feedback