TX SJR45 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment regarding the powers of the governor, the legislature, and the supreme court following certain disaster or emergency declarations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment regarding the powers of the governor, the legislature, and the supreme court following certain disaster or emergency declarations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-16HouseRead first time
2021-04-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-13SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenatePassed
2021-04-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-04SenateFiled
2021-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB1025 (Enabled by) 2021-04-16 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback