TX SJR45 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment for filling vacancies in appellate judicial offices by appointment, for partisan elections for all judicial offices, and for subsequent nonpartisan retention elections for all judicial offices.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment for filling vacancies in appellate judicial offices by appointment, for partisan elections for all judicial offices, and for subsequent nonpartisan retention elections for all judicial offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB1718 (Enabled by) 2011-05-30 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Elections--Judicial
Governor
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Courts--Appellate
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Judges
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Elections--Judicial
Governor
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SJR45 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SJ00045I.htm |