TX SJR42 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in educational functions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in educational functions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Finance
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-02-22SenateFiled
2017-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB1030 (Enabled by) 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback