TX SJR4 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to increase the minimum amount that the state may contribute to the Employees Retirement System of Texas and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to increase the minimum amount that the state may contribute to the Employees Retirement System of Texas and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HJR84 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback