TX SJR4 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to increase the minimum amount that the state may contribute to the Employees Retirement System of Texas and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to increase the minimum amount that the state may contribute to the Employees Retirement System of Texas and the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR84 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR4 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00004I.htm |