TX SJR37 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the denial of bail to an accused person if necessary to ensure the person's appearance in court and the safety of the community and the victim of the alleged offense.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the denial of bail to an accused person if necessary to ensure the person's appearance in court and the safety of the community and the victim of the alleged offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB628 (Enabled by) 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
HJR62 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HJR62 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR37 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00037I.htm |