TX SJR32 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize a political subdivision other than a school district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the political subdivision may impose on the residence homesteads of persons who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize a political subdivision other than a school district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the political subdivision may impose on the residence homesteads of persons who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-11 | Senate | No action taken in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB489 (Enabled by) 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Disabilities, Persons with
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions