TX SJR27 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the use of state funds to pay for the obligations of a local public retirement system.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the use of state funds to pay for the obligations of a local public retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR75 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Subjects
DEBT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations