TX SJR22 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-10 | Filed | |
2009-02-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR54 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
SB746 (Enabled by) 2009-02-25 - Referred to Finance
SB746 (Enabled by) 2009-02-25 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration