TX SJR18 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to permit the Texas Transportation Commission, subject to legislative review and approval, to designate the area adjacent to a state highway project as a transportation finance zone and dedicating the proceeds of the state sales and use taxes imposed in a transportation finance zone to the Texas Mobility Fund for certain purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to permit the Texas Transportation Commission, subject to legislative review and approval, to designate the area adjacent to a state highway project as a transportation finance zone and dedicating the proceeds of the state sales and use taxes imposed in a transportation finance zone to the Texas Mobility Fund for certain purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-26 Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2009-05-24 Considered in Calendars
2009-05-22 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-05-22 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-21 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-05-20 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-05-20 Considered in formal meeting
2009-05-12 Left pending in committee
2009-05-12 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-05-12 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-11 Posting rule suspended
2009-04-21 Referred to Transportation
2009-04-21 Read first time
2009-04-20 Received from the Senate
2009-04-17 Reported engrossed
2009-04-17 Remarks ordered printed
2009-04-17 Record vote
2009-04-17 Passed
2009-04-17 Read 3rd time
2009-04-17 Record vote
2009-04-17 Three day rule suspended
2009-04-17 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-04-17 Passed to engrossment as amended
2009-04-17 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-04-17 Amended
2009-04-17 Amendment(s) offered
2009-04-17 Read 2nd time
2009-04-17 Record vote
2009-04-17 Rules suspended-Regular order of business
2009-04-17 Placed on intent calendar
2009-04-08 Not again placed on intent calendar
2009-04-07 Placed on intent calendar
2009-04-02 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-02 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-03-30 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-30 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-26 Left pending in committee
2009-03-26 Testimony taken in committee
2009-03-26 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-26 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-13 Referred to Finance
2009-03-13 Read first time
2009-01-21 Filed
2009-01-21 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB505 (Enabled by) 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback