TX SJR1 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 5 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-06 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide for the transfer of certain general revenue to the economic stabilization fund and to the state highway fund and for the dedication of the revenue transferred to the state highway fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide for the transfer of certain general revenue to the economic stabilization fund and to the state highway fund and for the dedication of the revenue transferred to the state highway fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-05 - House - SJR 1Third Reading House (Y: 106 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-06 Filed with the Secretary of State
2013-08-05HouseSigned in the House
2013-08-05SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-08-05SenateReported enrolled
2013-08-05SenateHouse passage reported
2013-08-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-08-05HouseRecord vote
2013-08-05HouseAdopted
2013-08-05HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-08-05HouseRead 2nd time
2013-08-05HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2013-08-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-08-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-08-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-08-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-08-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-08-05HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2013-07-31HouseReferred to Transportation Funding, Select
2013-07-31HouseRead first time
2013-07-31HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-07-30SenateReported engrossed
2013-07-30SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2013-07-30SenateRecord vote
2013-07-30SenatePassed
2013-07-30SenateRead 3rd time
2013-07-30SenateRecord vote
2013-07-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-07-30SenateRecord vote
2013-07-30SenatePassed to engrossment
2013-07-30SenateRecord vote
2013-07-30SenateAmendment tabled
2013-07-30SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-07-30SenateRead 2nd time
2013-07-30SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-07-30SenateOrdered not printed
2013-07-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-07-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-07-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-07-30SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-07-30SenateReferred to Finance
2013-07-30SenateRead first time
2013-07-30SenateFiled
2013-07-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB1 (Enabled by) 2013-07-11 - Left pending in committee
SB1 (Enabled by) 2013-07-31 - Referred to Transportation Funding, Select
HB1 (Enabled by) 2013-08-07 - Effective on adoption of const. amendment

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback