TX SCR63 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Designating San Marcos as the Mermaid Capital of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating San Marcos as the Mermaid Capital of Texas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAdopted
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Administration
2019-05-15SenateRead first time
2019-05-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HCR176 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback