TX SCR60 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in SB 1281.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in SB 1281.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Read & adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Adopted RV#1802 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Adopted RV#1802 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-31 | House | Record vote RV#1802 |
2021-05-31 | House | Adopted SB 1281 |
2021-05-31 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read & adopted SB 1281 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |