TX SCR52 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to pass S.2896, the Care Veterans Deserve Act of 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - Adopted RV#1250 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HouseAdopted
2017-05-12HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-12HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateAdopted
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-04-18SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenatePermission to introduce
2017-04-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback