TX SCR41 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing Ricardo H. Hinojosa for 40 years of judicial service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing Ricardo H. Hinojosa for 40 years of judicial service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05 Signed by the Governor
2023-04-24 Sent to the Governor
2023-04-24HouseSigned in the House
2023-04-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-04-20SenateReported enrolled
2023-04-20SenateHouse passage reported
2023-04-20HouseAdopted
2023-04-20HouseLaid before the House
2023-04-20HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-04-17HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-11HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2023-04-06SenateRead & adopted
2023-04-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback