TX SCR11 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the lieutenant governor and the speaker to appoint interim joint committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the lieutenant governor and the speaker to appoint interim joint committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - House - Adopted RV#2032 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Filed with the Secretary of State
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseAdopted
2017-05-28HouseRules suspended
2017-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-20HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-09HouseReferred to House Administration
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateAdopted
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Administration
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2017-01-24SenateFiled
2017-01-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback