TX SCR1 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law, under a federal mandate, that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of certain offenses.
Title
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law, under a federal mandate, that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1204 (Y: 103 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1204 |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HCR 4 |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR4 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses