TX SB991 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a pilot program for the issuance of digital identification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a pilot program for the issuance of digital identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24SenateAmended
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB181 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback