TX SB989 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting certain limitations on the operation of certain alcoholic beverage businesses and organizations that benefit veterans during a declared state of disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting certain limitations on the operation of certain alcoholic beverage businesses and organizations that benefit veterans during a declared state of disaster.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-03SenateFiled
2021-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4155 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs
SB2201 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback