TX SB988 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the participation of a county judge in a meeting of a commissioners court conducted by videoconference call.
Title
Relating to the participation of a county judge in a meeting of a commissioners court conducted by videoconference call.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--Judges
Electronic Information Systems
Open Meetings
VIDEOCONFERENCING
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--Judges
Electronic Information Systems
Open Meetings
VIDEOCONFERENCING