TX SB987 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibitions on camping in a public place; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibitions on camping in a public place; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-03SenateFiled
2021-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1925 (Same As) 2021-05-31 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback