TX SB983 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to legislative leave for certain peace officers commissioned by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to legislative leave for certain peace officers commissioned by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3216 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Subjects
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
State Employees
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
State Employees