TX SB979 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disposition of real property intended for high-speed rail projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disposition of real property intended for high-speed rail projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-01HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateAmendment amended
2017-04-18SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-04-18SenateVote reconsidered
2017-04-18SenateVote reconsidered
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateAmended
2017-04-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback