TX SB977 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of state money for high-speed rail operated by a private entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of state money for high-speed rail operated by a private entity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1481 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1441 (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed to engrossment as amended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateAmended
2017-04-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-06SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB977
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00977I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00977S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00977E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00977H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00977F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-18-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-18-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB977&RcdVtNo=1441&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB977&RcdVtNo=1481&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017

Bill Comments

feedback