TX SB970 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a sexual assault policy at public and private institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a sexual assault policy at public and private institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-11SenateRecord vote
2017-04-11SenatePassed
2017-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-11SenateRecord vote
2017-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback