TX SB969 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of personal delivery and mobile carrying devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of personal delivery and mobile carrying devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-01HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-21SenateFiled
2019-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2301 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback