TX SB966 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to criminal offenses regarding the consumption or possession of alcoholic beverages by a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal offenses regarding the consumption or possession of alcoholic beverages by a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1366 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateAmended
2017-04-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-21SenateFiled
2017-02-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback