TX SB962 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the use and disclosure of certain genetic material and genetic information; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the use and disclosure of certain genetic material and genetic information; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4441 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
DNA
Health Care Providers
Protection of Personal Information
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
DNA
Health Care Providers
Protection of Personal Information