TX SB959 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the adoption of the Compact for a Balanced Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the adoption of the Compact for a Balanced Budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-17SenateFiled
2017-02-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback