TX SB952 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to plot plan requirements for an application for a standard permit for a concrete batch plant issued by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to plot plan requirements for an application for a standard permit for a concrete batch plant issued by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-03SenateFiled
2021-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB416 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Postponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback